+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB823ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB823ER)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (67-Y 29-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 29-N 2-A)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104616D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (9)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (35-Y 0-N 4-A)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 29-N 2-A)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Passed Senate (19-Y 18-N 3-A)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Finance (12-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor