+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 473 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB821ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB821ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB821S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106141D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18106141D-S1
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 18104348D
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Local Government with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor