+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB818ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 13100859D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB818E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On December 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100859D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor