+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (15-Y 81-N)
- Read third time
- Defeated by House (15-Y 81-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 030795508-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/06/03 030795508
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: DEFEATED (15-Y 81-N)
February 17, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor