+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0143)
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 143 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB814ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed 996505747
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 1999: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor