+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Ball, Dickinson, Diamonstein, Callahan
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Gartlan, Holland, R.J., Wampler, Schewel
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 38-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 1-N)
- Passed House with substitute (93-Y 1-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7961124 (SB81H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD1682809 (SB81E)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (38-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (2-Y 38-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (93-Y 1-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor