+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 132 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB807ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N)
On December 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101893D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2023: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
January 17, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2023: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor