+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB806E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 11100658D-E
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100658D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 27, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
January 25, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor