+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 55 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB806ER)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/06/03 035184510