+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chair votes Yes
- Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107417D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB805S1
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20107417D-S1
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103176D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 4, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Joseph D. Morrissey
Type:
Primary Sponsor