+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 450 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB801ER)
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/06/03 033711464
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2003: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2003: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor