+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (66)
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 831 (effective 7/1/17)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #4 (16-Y 23-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendations #1, #2, #3 agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, #2, #3 (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation to Amendmends #1, 2 and 3 (98-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, #2, #3 (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB800ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Communicated to Governor
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB800ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 28-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (61-Y 28-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stanley, Dunnavant, Barker
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Landes, Kilgore, Bagby
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N 1-A)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 31-N)
- Passed House with substitute (65-Y 31-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended SB800H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105478D-H1
- Read third time
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17105478D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute reconsidered (38-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute rejected 17104978D-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 17105235D-S2 (Barker)
- Substitute by Senator Barker agreed to 17105235D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB800S2
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104978D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104978D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On October 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100678D