+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 809 (effective 7/1/12)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB80ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB80ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 12101120D-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB80E
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101120D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Reported from Local Government with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor