+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Title replaced
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 824 (effective 4/20/94)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB80ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time
- Read second time
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (94-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (94-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD7199605 (SB80S1)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (32-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (94-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (32-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor