+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 781 (effective 1/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB796ER)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 18108233D-S2
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Gilbert, Robinson, Herring
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Sturtevant, Dunnavant, Dance
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107608D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB796H1
- Passed House with substitute (87-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107608D-H1
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107046D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB796S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107046D-S1
- Incorporates SB892 (Wexton)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18101234D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (12)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 7-N)
March 8, 2018: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2018: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
March 7, 2018: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N)
March 1, 2018: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor