+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 342 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB796ER)
On February 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by conference committee
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (75-Y 20-N)
On February 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Amended by conference committee
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Delegates: Black, Marshall, Darner
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senators: Quayle, Mims, Whipple
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE CONF. COMM. (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Motion to insist and request Conf. Comm. withdrawn
- Motion to recede from amendment rejected (26-Y 69-N)
- VOTE: (26-Y 69-N)
- House insisted on amendment
- House requested conference committee
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (1-Y 39-N)
- House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- Passed House with amendment (95-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment #2 by Del. Marshall agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment #1 by Del. Marshall rejected
- Read third time
On February 9, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/05/00 013069500