+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
On March 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB795ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
- Passed House (87-Y 11-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 052907840
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N)
February 18, 2005: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2005: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2005: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor