+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Incorporated by Fin. (SB791-Chichester) by voice vote
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/04/00 015909476
+ − Votes (3)
January 23, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2001: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor