+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0179)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 179 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB792ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
On December 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100616D
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor