+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (37-Y 1-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Title replaced
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB79ER)
On March 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed LD7977605 (SB79S2)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 2-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Andrews, Walker, Colgan, Chichester
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Ball, Dickinson, Diamonstein, Callahan
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (6-Y 33-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (6-Y 33-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by temporarily
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
- Passed House with substitute (91-Y 6-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- VOTE: (94-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (94-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed LD7960124 (SB79H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7194605 (SB79S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (37-Y 1-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE AMENDMENT (6-Y 33-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: (94-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor