+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB79ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB79S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103870D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14103870D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On December 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100513D
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor