+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0942)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 942 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (23-Y 73-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (23-Y 73-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB785ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (93-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N)
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On December 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078900700
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (23-Y 73-N)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N)
February 12, 2007: Reported from Finance (16-Y 2-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor