+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 15103649D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB783S1
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15103649D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102958D