+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/11)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB782ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB782S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104250D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104250D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On December 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100937D
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor