+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: #2
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100665D
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
February 4, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor