+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0640)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 640 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB780ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 16104490D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2016: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor