+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (57)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0085)
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 85 (effective 3/11/94)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR GOV. RECOMMEND. (39-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled bill text (SB78ER)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7169605 (SB78H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Substitute by Sen. Walker agreed to
- Reconsider adoption of Committee amendments (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments void
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Floor substitute printed LD7162605 (SB78S1)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (35-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD7162605 (SB78E)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR GOV. RECOMMEND. (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (35-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor