+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- No action taken prior to 12 Midnight on 3/4/98
- Failed to pass in Senate
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Sub by Mr. Cranwell agreed to (48-Y 40-N) 985467176-H1
- VOTE: ADOPTION (48-Y 40-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. 985467176-H1 (Cranwell)
- Floor substitute printed 985467176-H1 (Cranwell)
- Passed House with substitute (49-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 40-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pending question ordered (23-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION R (23-Y 15-N)
- Passed by temporarily (21-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: PASS BY TEMPORARILY V (21-Y 18-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Forbes agreed to 985435657-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 985435657-S2
- Floor substitute printed 985435657-S2 (Forbes)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985422753-S1
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 987361753
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (9)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PENDING QUESTION R (23-Y 15-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (48-Y 40-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 40-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASS BY TEMPORARILY V (21-Y 18-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor