+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Tabled in Rules by voice vote
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB779E
- Printed as engrossed 072520796-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On December 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072520796
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor