+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0844)
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 844 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB778ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 089634240-S2
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Delegates: May, Hugo, Sickles
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senators: Herring, Edwards, Wagner
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 089562588-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB778H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 089562588-H1
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 089554240-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 089554240-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB778S1
- Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 080129240
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 8, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2008: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2008: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2008: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
February 29, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor