+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 31 (effective 3/22/22)
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB777ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage Emergency (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 22107222D-E
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Emergency clause added
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB777E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 22107222D
- Unanimous consent to introduce