+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0884)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 884 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB775ER)
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (51-Y 45-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 45-N)
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by temporarily
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (15-Y 9-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Rereferred to Transportation
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Amendment by Mr. Parrish no action taken
- Committee substitute agreed to 996741607-H1
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (17-Y 9-N)
- Committee substitute printed 996741607-H1
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On February 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 996729607-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 996729607-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 996729607-S1
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 993487760
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 45-N)
February 23, 1999: Reported from Tra. (15-Y 9-N)
February 16, 1999: Reported from Tra. w/sub. (17-Y 9-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor