+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0908)
On April 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 908 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB773ER)
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 007317210
- Introduced at the request of Governor
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor