+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0328)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 328 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB773ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100926D
+ − Votes (7)
February 11, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor