+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 327 (effective 7/1/13)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB772ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cosgrove, Helsel, Bulova
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators: Wagner, Reeves, Petersen
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB772H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105007D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13105007D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102244D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (13)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2013: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N)
February 14, 2013: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2013: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 3-N)
January 16, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor