+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB77ER)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1994: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor