+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 355 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0355)
On March 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB77ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 14104981D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB77H1
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104981D-H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104981D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104037D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB77S1
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 14104037D-S1
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N)
On December 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100296D
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2014: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2014: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor