+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0164)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 164 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/16
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB769ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented and ordered printed 16104349D
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2016: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
February 4, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor