+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 41 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB768ER)
- Enrolled
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100681D
+ − Votes (5)
February 8, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 10, 2013: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor