+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
On March 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 489 (effective 7/1/05)
On February 26, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB767ER)
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Passed House (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB767E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Bell agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 051207700-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 051207700
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
February 14, 2005: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor