+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Incorporated in other legislation (SB137-Stosch)
- No action taken by Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 007327532
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Consent to introduce (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2000: No action taken by Finance (23-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor