+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
On April 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB764ER)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (39-Y 0-N)
On March 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB764ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Floor amendment agreed to (Plum)
- Read third time
- Committee substitute rejected LD0975687-H1
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
- Passed House with amendment (91-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD0975687-H1
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD0967687-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD0967687-S1
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD0967687-S1
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub. (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed LD5354687