+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Presented and ordered printed 084335212
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2008: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2008: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor