+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0981)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 981 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB761ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage #2 (60-Y 38-N)
- Passed House (60-Y 38-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N)
- Passed House (63-Y 36-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N)
- Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107215D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB761S1
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20107215D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103308D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Passage #2 (60-Y 38-N)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N)
February 21, 2020: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 6-N)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
February 6, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2020: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
George L. Barker
Type:
Primary Sponsor