+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 200 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB760ER)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105494D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB760S1
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105494D-S1
- Incorporates SB724 (Dunnavant)
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102408D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2018: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor