+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 518 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0518)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB76ER)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Substitute by Delegate Landes withdrawn 18107953D-H1
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Floor substitute printed 18107953D-H1 (Landes)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18104868D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB76S1
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18104868D-S1
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100771D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health