+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
On April 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 501 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB76ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (91-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (17-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (35-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed