+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 113 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB757ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 087663320
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2008: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor