+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 243 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB756ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute Education and Health rejected 084090320-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute Finance agreed to 082924212-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB756S2
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 082924212-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 084090320-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 084797320
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2008: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 1-N)
February 4, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2008: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor