+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
On March 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB755ER)
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 3
On February 2, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/11/99 992423760